MN HF978 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Franke.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Franke.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support our students grant program funding provided, support our students grant program codified, and money appropriated.
Title
Support our students grant program funding provided, support our students grant program codified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] | Rep. Jon Applebaum [D] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Franke. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Liebling |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-03-23 | House | Authors added Johnson, C. and Applebaum. |
2017-03-20 | House | Authors added Zerwas and Omar. |
2017-03-16 | House | Authors added West, Uglem, and Dehn, R. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1186 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - Referred to E-12 Finance