MN HF972 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Torkelson.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Torkelson.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Medical Services Regulatory Board authorized to adopt rules authorizing certified emergency medical services personnel to assist with administering emergency prescription medications and participate in care coordination, and rulemaking required.
Title
Emergency Medical Services Regulatory Board authorized to adopt rules authorizing certified emergency medical services personnel to assist with administering emergency prescription medications and participate in care coordination, and rulemaking required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Torkelson. |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Theis. |
2018-02-22 | House | Author added Halverson. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1023 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy