MN HF968 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specified county offices appointment authorized.
Title
Specified county offices appointment authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] |
Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1731 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections