MN HF96 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Immunization exemption procedures modified.
Title
Immunization exemption procedures modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2017-05-10 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2017-03-14 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2017-01-17 | House | Authors added Youakim and Carlson, A. |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF143 (Similar To) 2017-01-17 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy