MN HF955 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Kresha
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Kresha
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SciTechsperience program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
SciTechsperience program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Kresha |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1652 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy