MN HF95 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-05 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-05 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance premium credit created.
Title
Health Insurance premium credit created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-05 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2009-02-05 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register | |
2009-02-02 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF49 | |
2009-01-26 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar January 29, 2009 | |
2009-01-26 | House: Second reading | |
2009-01-26 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-01-22 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2009-01-15 | House: Authors added Nelson and Anderson, S. | |
2009-01-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0095&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0095.0.pdf |