MN HF949 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Authors added Myers and Rehm
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Authors added Myers and Rehm
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Safety education required and water craft operators permitted, and motorboat rental business obligations imposed.
Title
Safety education required and water craft operators permitted, and motorboat rental business obligations imposed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Authors added Myers and Rehm |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Brand |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF553 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment, Climate, and Legacy