MN HF94 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Olson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Olson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; number of voters an individual may assist in marking a ballot increased.
Title
Elections; number of voters an individual may assist in marking a ballot increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Olson |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Bahner, Bernardy |
2019-01-30 | House | Division action, return to Government Operations |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Elkins; Xiong, J.; and Long |
2019-01-19 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF586 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections