MN HF927 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Author added Omar.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Author added Omar.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individuals age 21 years old allowed to consume and use marijuana for personal use, regulation provided, marijuana establishment activities permitted, rulemaking authorized, criminal penalties provided, and fee schedule and tax development required.
Title
Individuals age 21 years old allowed to consume and use marijuana for personal use, regulation provided, marijuana establishment activities permitted, rulemaking authorized, criminal penalties provided, and fee schedule and tax development required.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Applebaum [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Author added Omar. |
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Davnie. |
2017-04-24 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2017-03-28 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-02-20 | House | Author added Hausman. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1320 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy