MN HF925 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Dissemination and calculation of the state unemployment rate regulated, and use of funds authorized.
Title
Dissemination and calculation of the state unemployment rate regulated, and use of funds authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] | Rep. Thomas Rukavina [D] |
Rep. Anthony Sertich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Governor veto | |
2009-05-22 | Governor's action Veto | |
2009-05-20 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-17 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-17 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-17 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-05-17 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2009-05-17 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: General Orders: To pass Rule 22.3 suspended, lie-over waived | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1368 | |
2009-05-11 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-05-11 | House: Third reading | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-05-08 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-04-16 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-16 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-04-02 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-04-02 | House: Motion to re-refer Ways and Means | |
2009-04-01 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-01 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-03-23 | House: Author added Reinert | |
2009-03-23 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2009-03-17 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division | |
2009-03-16 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-03-16 | House: Referred by Chair to Bioscience and Workforce Development Policy and Oversight Division | |
2009-03-16 | House: Referred by Chair to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division | |
2009-03-11 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Commerce and Labor | |
2009-02-28 | House: Referred by Chair to Labor and Consumer Protection Division | |
2009-02-19 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor |