MN HF910 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Newborn hearing screening advisory committee expiration date extended.
Title
Newborn hearing screening advisory committee expiration date extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1021 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Second reading