MN HF9 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; law enforcement and family members enabled to petition a court to prohibit people from possessing firearms if they pose a significant danger to themselves or others by possessing a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; law enforcement and family members enabled to petition a court to prohibit people from possessing firearms if they pose a significant danger to themselves or others by possessing a firearm.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-28HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-10HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF436 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback