MN HF890 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus education finance bill.
Title
Omnibus education finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 76 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Passage (Y: 75 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 76 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Passage (Y: 75 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 43 | |
2017-05-12 | Governor's action Veto | |
2017-05-12 | Governor veto | |
2017-05-10 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 34-32 |
2017-05-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-32 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-09 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 72-59 |
2017-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 76-56 |
2017-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate conferees Nelson, Pratt, Eichorn, Weber, and Wiger. |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-18 | House | House conferees Loon, Erickson, Bennett, Kresha, and Murphy, M. |
2017-04-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Nelson; Pratt; Eichorn; Weber; Wiger |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House conferees Loon; Erickson; Bennett; Kresha; Murphy, M. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-28 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF718 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF718, now on General Orders |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 75-54 |
2017-03-31 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-03-31 | House | Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Author stricken Lillie. |
2017-03-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, March 31, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-09 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF718 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF890