MN HF89 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Author added Christensen.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small business investment credit modified, definitions added, applicant business additional information required, priority businesses provided, allocation of credits modified, and credit made permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small business investment credit modified, definitions added, applicant business additional information required, priority businesses provided, allocation of credits modified, and credit made permanent.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseAuthor added Christensen.
2018-04-16HouseAuthors added Petersburg, Gunther, Haley, Schomacker, Theis, and Kresha.
2018-03-12HouseAuthor added Koznick.
2017-02-22HouseAuthor added Dettmer.
2017-02-20HouseAuthor added Barr, R.
2017-02-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2017-01-12HouseAuthor added Albright.
2017-01-11HouseAuthor added Howe.
2017-01-09HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF1668 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Authors added Rest; Senjem

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback