MN HF89 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Instructional materials tax exemption modified.
Title
Instructional materials tax exemption modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-01-22 | House | Author added Lien. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF103 (Similar To) 2015-01-20 - Author added Sheran