MN HF89 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Voter picture identification required before receiving a ballot, voter identification card provided at no charge, canvassing deadlines changed, notice required, provisional balloting procedure established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter picture identification required before receiving a ballot, voter identification card provided at no charge, canvassing deadlines changed, notice required, provisional balloting procedure established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-27HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2011-04-14HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation Policy and Finance
2011-03-03HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2011-02-14HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
2011-02-07HouseAuthor added Mazorol
2011-01-20HouseAuthor added Holberg
2011-01-18HouseAuthors added McDonald, Leidiger, Crawford, Hancock, Abeler, Downey, Shimanski and Urdahl
2011-01-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback