MN HF862 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Children and Families Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Children and Families Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support staff persons required for early childhood family education programs, and money appropriated.
Title
Support staff persons required for early childhood family education programs, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] |
Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Author added Hussein |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1240 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Author added Duckworth