MN HF857 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Small business certification program data classified, and Legislative Commission on Data Practices and Personal Data Privacy directed to study and recommend options for expanding public access to legislative records and meetings.
Title
Small business certification program data classified, and Legislative Commission on Data Practices and Personal Data Privacy directed to study and recommend options for expanding public access to legislative records and meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF817 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Second reading