MN HF837 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 14 04/03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 14 04/03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State road construction appropriation modified.
Title
State road construction appropriation modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Secretary of State Chapter 14 04/03/17 | |
2017-04-03 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-04-03 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2017-04-03 | Governor approval | |
2017-04-03 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned from Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF821 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF821, now on General Orders |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 130-0 |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Amended |
2017-03-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Author stricken Johnson, C. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2017-02-23 | House | Author added Peterson. |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF821 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF837