MN HF808 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Davis
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Davis
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family law; parenting time provisions modified.
Title
Family law; parenting time provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Davis |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Brand |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Mueller |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Dotseth |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Hudson |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF900 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Author added Farnsworth