MN HF802 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Erin's Law personal safety instruction required.
Title
Erin's Law personal safety instruction required.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Hassan |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Backer and Zerwas |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Nash, West, and Dettmer |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Poston, Theis, and Anderson |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Nornes and Daniels |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1498 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy