MN HF80 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Author added Poppe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Capital investment; previously authorized capital projects funding source changed, spending authorized to acquire and better public land and buildings and other improvements of a capital nature, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital investment; previously authorized capital projects funding source changed, spending authorized to acquire and better public land and buildings and other improvements of a capital nature, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Poppe
2019-02-07HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Edelson.
2019-01-31HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-01-29HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Davnie
2019-01-24HouseAuthor added Lillie
2019-01-22HouseAuthors added Hansen and Lee
2019-01-17HouseReferred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback