MN HF799 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Duty owed by owners of real property to trespassers specified.
Title
Duty owed by owners of real property to trespassers specified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. David Dill [D] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Second reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 08, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-02-18 | House | Author added Vogel. |
2015-02-16 | House | Author added Smith. |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices |
Same As/Similar To
SF395 (Similar To) 2015-01-29 - Referred to Judiciary