MN HF795 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Author added Masin.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Author added Masin.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health plans and public health care programs required to cover a 12-month supply of prescription contraceptives; religious exemptions provided; and health plans required to cover contraceptive methods, sterilization, related medical services, patient education, and counseling.
Title
Health plans and public health care programs required to cover a 12-month supply of prescription contraceptives; religious exemptions provided; and health plans required to cover contraceptive methods, sterilization, related medical services, patient education, and counseling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Author added Masin. |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2017-02-09 | House | Authors added Slocum, Schultz, and Bly. |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF409 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Author added Marty