MN HF785 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health plan coverage provided for acupuncture services.
Title
Health plan coverage provided for acupuncture services.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-15 | House | Authors added Munson and Reyer |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Theis |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1058 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Author added Abeler