MN HF779 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commissioners in eminent domain actions requirements modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioners in eminent domain actions requirements modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading
2021-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2021-02-10HouseAuthor added Munson
2021-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF747 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback