MN HF779 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction materials purchased by certain contractors exemption provisions modified, and refund provision added.
Title
Construction materials purchased by certain contractors exemption provisions modified, and refund provision added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1589 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Taxes