MN HF779 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture Research, Education, Extension, and Technology Transfer Board established; and money appropriated.
Title
Agriculture Research, Education, Extension, and Technology Transfer Board established; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF820 (Similar To) 2015-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government