MN HF779 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health plan policy and contract coverages regulated, state law conformed to federal requirements, health plan market rules established, and essential community providers designation modified.
Title
Health plan policy and contract coverages regulated, state law conformed to federal requirements, health plan market rules established, and essential community providers designation modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Thomas Huntley [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: Atkins Motion to Concur (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 74 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 71 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: Atkins Motion to Concur (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 74 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 71 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 84 | |
2013-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 73-59 |
2013-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 72-60 |
2013-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2013-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 40-23 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-22 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 74-60 |
2013-04-22 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-04-22 | House | Amended |
2013-04-19 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2013-04-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 22, 2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | House | Author added Moran |
2013-03-14 | House | Author added Abeler |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance vote: 71-61 |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |