MN HF752 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filmmaking and film education facility funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Filmmaking and film education facility funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Leigh Finke [D] | Rep. Maria Perez-Vega [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] |
Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Author added Edelson |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-25 | House | Authors added Sencer-Mura and Lillie |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF289 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Capital Investment