MN HF751 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation Finance
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation Finance
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
St. Paul; Central Station on the Central Corridor light rail transit line skyway access requirements established.
Title
St. Paul; Central Station on the Central Corridor light rail transit line skyway access requirements established.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Michael Beard [R] |
Rep. Michael Paymar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2013-03-04 | House | Author added Paymar |
2013-02-25 | House | Author added Beard |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy |