MN HF745 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Municipalities authorized to establish street improvement districts and apportion street improvement fees within districts, adoption of street improvement plan required, and collection of fees authorized.
Title
Municipalities authorized to establish street improvement districts and apportion street improvement fees within districts, adoption of street improvement plan required, and collection of fees authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] |
Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation Policy |
2013-03-11 | House | Author added Bly |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |