MN HF739 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Small wireless facility collocation provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small wireless facility collocation provided.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 124 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 51 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-21SenateSecond reading
2017-05-21SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 Suspended
2017-05-21SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2017-05-21SenateComm report: To pass
2017-05-20SenateReferred to Local Government
2017-05-20SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-20SenateReceived from House
2017-05-20HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 76-50
2017-05-20HouseThird reading as amended
2017-05-20HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-18HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 20, 2017
2017-05-17HouseSecond reading
2017-05-17HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2017-05-17HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2017-05-16HouseAuthor added O'Neill as chief author.
2017-03-23HouseAuthor stricken Slocum.
2017-03-16HouseAuthor added Albright.
2017-03-08HouseAuthor added Poston.
2017-03-08HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
2017-03-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
2017-02-27HouseAuthor added Bahr, C.
2017-02-02HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF561 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0739&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF739&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF739&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF739&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF739&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF739&version=4&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0739&session_number=0&year=2017&id=326
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0739&session_number=0&year=2017&id=327
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0739&session_number=0&year=2017&id=328

Bill Comments

feedback