MN HF738 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 218 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 218 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public notice provided for the release hearing for killers of peace officers, and harassment restraining order provisions modified.
Title
Public notice provided for the release hearing for killers of peace officers, and harassment restraining order provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Joe Mullery [D] |
Rep. Kerry Gauthier [D] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 218 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 130-0 |
2012-04-19 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-04-19 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-04-19 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-19 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 59-0 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Laid on table |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Taken from table |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-05-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 134-0 |
2011-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2011-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-02 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
2011-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Policy and Finance |