MN HF732 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School-linked mental health grants funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
School-linked mental health grants funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] |
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Daniels |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2299 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy