MN HF725 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federally qualified health center and rural health clinic alternative payment methodology established, federally qualified health center and rural health clinic payments modified, and report required.
Title
Federally qualified health center and rural health clinic alternative payment methodology established, federally qualified health center and rural health clinic payments modified, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |