MN HF724 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Authors added Jordan, Sandell, Her, and Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Authors added Jordan, Sandell, Her, and Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Parentage of a woman who provides donated ova clarified, and rights of spouse to parentage when assisted reproductive technology is used clarified.
Title
Parentage of a woman who provides donated ova clarified, and rights of spouse to parentage when assisted reproductive technology is used clarified.
Sponsors
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Steve Sandell [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Authors added Jordan, Sandell, Her, and Moller |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Huot |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF755 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Author added Clausen