MN HF724 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Basic sliding fee child care assistance program forecasted, and child care assistance provider reimbursement rates modified.
Title
Basic sliding fee child care assistance program forecasted, and child care assistance provider reimbursement rates modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Mahoney. |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Liebling. |
2017-02-02 | House | Authors added Dehn, R.; Clark; Schultz; and Thissen. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF560 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy