MN HF721 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Sandstede
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Sandstede
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insecticide use in wildlife management areas prohibited.
Title
Insecticide use in wildlife management areas prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lesch |
2019-02-27 | House | Authors added Tabke and Vang |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Carlson, L.; Dehn; Wolgamott; and Koegel |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Xiong, J.; Richardson; Olson; Lislegard; Davnie; Lippert; and Her |
2019-02-21 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Kunesh-Podein and Huot |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Fischer, Wagenius, Sundin, Persell, Morrison, Becker-Finn, Sandell, Claflin, and Xiong, T. |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF941 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Withdrawn and returned to author