MN HF717 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Cannabis task force created, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis task force created, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Munson
2019-03-27HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-27HouseRecalled by Chair Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Miller
2019-03-13HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-13HouseAuthors added Poston and Loeffler
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF897 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Author added Jensen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback