MN HF70 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Task Force on Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women created, annual report on issues related to violence against indigenous women and girls required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women created, annual report on issues related to violence against indigenous women and girls required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Albright motion - Recall and Re-refer (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Albright motion - Recall and Re-refer (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-05-13SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-13SenateReceived from House
2019-05-09HouseBill was passed
2019-05-09HouseThird reading
2019-05-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 09, 2019
2019-03-07HouseSecond reading
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-27HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-12HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-04HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-30HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail Government Operations
2019-01-17HouseAuthor added Halverson
2019-01-14HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF515 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback