MN HF7 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Electric utility renewable energy standard obligations modified, cost recovery provided, wind projects exempted from certificate of need proceedings, low-voltage transmission line included in solar energy generating system definition, local energy employment provisions added, and Public Utility Commission permit authority modified for electric generation facilities.
Title
Electric utility renewable energy standard obligations modified, cost recovery provided, wind projects exempted from certificate of need proceedings, low-voltage transmission line included in solar energy generating system definition, local energy employment provisions added, and Public Utility Commission permit authority modified for electric generation facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Taken from table (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Taken from table (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Appeal of the Speaker (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H0007A35 (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H0007A32 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H0007A34 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H0007A27 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Schultz - Amendment - A23-0012 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Niska - Amendment - H0007A38 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - A23-0013 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - H0007A31 (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Nash - Amendment - H0007A39 (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A19 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A16 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A13 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A36 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A29 (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007DE2 (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: 74 - Amendment to Long Amendment - Nays (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Taken from table (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Taken from table (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Appeal of the Speaker (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H0007A35 (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H0007A32 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H0007A34 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H0007A27 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Schultz - Amendment - A23-0012 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Niska - Amendment - H0007A38 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - A23-0013 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - H0007A31 (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Nash - Amendment - H0007A39 (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A19 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A16 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A13 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A36 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007A29 (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H0007DE2 (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House: 74 - Amendment to Long Amendment - Nays (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Secretary of State Chapter 7 | |
2023-02-07 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-02-07 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-02-07 | Governor approval | |
2023-02-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-02-06 | House | Returned from Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Taken from table |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Laid on table |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF4 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4, now on General Orders |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-26 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-01-26 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-01-26 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2023-01-26 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2023-01-26 | House | Amended |
2023-01-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, January 26, 2023 |
2023-01-23 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2023-01-23 | House | Motion to re-refer Sustainable Infrastructure Policy |
2023-01-23 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2023-01-23 | House | Motion to re-refer Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2023-01-23 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2023-01-23 | House | Motion to re-refer Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
2023-01-19 | House | Second reading |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-01-05 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-01-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4 (Similar To) 2023-02-01 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF7, SF indefinitely postponed