MN HF698 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement adoption of human sex trafficking investigation cases policies required.
Title
Law enforcement adoption of human sex trafficking investigation cases policies required.
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Mueller [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] |
Rep. Susan Akland [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF820 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy