MN HF680 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Leashed dog use allowed to track big game, artificial light use modified, and criminal penalties provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leashed dog use allowed to track big game, artificial light use modified, and criminal penalties provided.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 100 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 100 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2019-03-25SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-25SenateReceived from House
2019-03-21HouseBill was passed
2019-03-21HouseThird reading
2019-03-21HouseAmendments offered
2019-03-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 21, 2019
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Heintzeman
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1177 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0680&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF680&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF680&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0680&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10092
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0680&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10093
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0680&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10092
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0680&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10093

Bill Comments

feedback