MN HF68 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Long-range transportation planning functions transferred from Metropolitan Council to Department of Transportation.
Title
Long-range transportation planning functions transferred from Metropolitan Council to Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Scott |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |