MN HF668 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Anselmo.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Anselmo.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dyslexia and literacy specialist required, and money appropriated.
Title
Dyslexia and literacy specialist required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Anselmo. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Freiberg. |
2017-02-23 | House | Authors added Sauke, Liebling, and Pierson. |
2017-02-22 | House | Authors added Bernardy, Lillie, O'Driscoll, and Pinto. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Ward. |
2017-02-09 | House | Authors added Theis, Dettmer, Lohmer, Bly, and Lien. |
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Haley. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF453 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Finance