MN HF663 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personal care assistance agency enrollment requirements established, personal care assistant and qualified professional additional duties established, personal care assistance service payment rate methodology established, commissioner of human services required to study methodology, providers required to submit workforce data, and reports required.
Title
Personal care assistance agency enrollment requirements established, personal care assistant and qualified professional additional duties established, personal care assistance service payment rate methodology established, commissioner of human services required to study methodology, providers required to submit workforce data, and reports required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Acomb |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Her |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF497 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Authors added Duckworth; Mathews; Dornink; Johnson Stewart