MN HF660 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth intervention programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Youth intervention programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-03-27 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Loon. |
2017-02-20 | House | Authors added Poston and Bernardy. |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2017-02-02 | House | Authors added Howe, Pinto, and Dehn, R. |
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF459 (Similar To) 2017-01-30 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy