MN HF653 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate conferees Ruud, Lang, Senjem, Koran and Cohen.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate conferees Ruud, Lang, Senjem, Koran and Cohen.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus legacy finance bill.
Title
Omnibus legacy finance bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 100 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment, as amended - A19-0531 (Y: 73 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment to Green Amendment - H0653A26 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment to Green Amendment - H0653A24 (Y: 25 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment - H0653A16 (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment - A19-0490 (Y: 50 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 100 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment, as amended - A19-0531 (Y: 73 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment to Green Amendment - H0653A26 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment to Green Amendment - H0653A24 (Y: 25 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment - H0653A16 (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Green - Amendment - A19-0490 (Y: 50 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Senate conferees Ruud, Lang, Senjem, Koran and Cohen. |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate conferees Ruud; Lang; Senjem; Koran; Cohen |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House conferees Lillie; Murphy; Wazlawik; Hansen; Boe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-05-09 | House | House conferees Lillie, Murphy, Wazlawik, Hansen, Boe |
2019-05-09 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF836 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF836, now on the General Orders |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-02 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended |
2019-04-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 02, 2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division |
2019-03-05 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF836 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF653