MN HF653 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 313 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 313 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal precinct and ward boundary procedures and requirements changed.
Title
Municipal precinct and ward boundary procedures and requirements changed.
Sponsors
Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Cy Thao [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 313 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-11 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-07 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: Conference committee report | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-04 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-04 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-04 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-04 | House: Conference committee report | |
2010-04-27 | House: Senate conferees Pappas, Sieben, Gerlach | |
2010-04-27 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-04-26 | House: House conferees Kahn, Winkler, Holberg | |
2010-04-26 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-26 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: Senate conferees Pappas; Sieben; Gerlach | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: House conferees Kahn; Winkler; Holberg | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF834 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-03-22 | House: Third reading | |
2010-03-18 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-02-18 | House: Second reading | |
2010-02-18 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-05-18 | House: House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2009-03-05 | House: Second reading | |
2009-03-05 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-02-09 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |